THE EPIPHANY TRUST (TRURO) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust promotes the Christian faith and ministry by helping the poor and sick, encouraging education and other charitable activities. The Trust does this by: -Quiet days -Retreats and facilities for private study and prayer -Letting rooms in our peacful House to organisations associated with the Christian faith, charities and others whose function is to provide similar services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 02 June 2003: Standard registration
- EPIPHANY HOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Reverend Jeffrey Edward Risbridger | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Emma Carlyon | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
William John Clyde Mitchell | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Mitchell | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev DEREK JOHN COLLINS | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr MICHAEL THOMAS TEDDER | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER JAMES BIRKHEAD BERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ANN LIDGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £296.40k | £197.14k | £200.00k | £257.94k | £224.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.35k | £190.66k | £167.72k | £163.98k | £241.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £71.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 DECEMBER 1956 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION'S DATED 28 APRIL 1961, 13 NOVEMBER 1989, 23 MAY 2002 AND 10 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE PROMOTION OF ITS PRACTICE, THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE OLD OR POOR OR SICK, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE REFORMING OF THOSE WHO SHALL HAVE LED OR BE IN DANGER OF LEADING IMMORAL LIVES AND THE UNDERTAKING OF ANY OTHER PROJECT WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE DIOCESE OF TRURO
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE EPIPHANY TRUST (TRURO) LTD
KENWYN CHURCH ROAD
TRURO
TR1 3DR
- Phone:
- 01872272249
- Email:
- info@epiphanyhouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window