Accounts and annual returns VETERANS GARAGE LIMITED

Charity number: 1069359
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2019 28 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 14 April 2020 108 days late