Financial history SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF MANCHESTER

Charity Number: 1064903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.29k £5.77k £7.10k £12.29k £28.51k
Total expenditure £2.91k £6.19k £9.47k £12.26k £24.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.78k