Financial history CHRIST VICTORY CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1065035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.94k £44.49k £54.87k £51.04k £49.35k
Total expenditure £12.53k £21.66k £33.77k £20.16k £29.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A