CHRIST VICTORY CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities related to the church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Ghana
- Italy
Governance
- 27 October 1997: Standard registration
- CHRIST VICTORY CHURCH (Working name)
- GOD'S HEALING MINISTRY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR OSMAN | Chair |
|
||||||
Stephanie Maty | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Mamley Bampoe | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Augustine Okoro Okoronkwo | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kwadwo Osei-Asibey | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
PASTOR FRED | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.94k | £44.49k | £54.87k | £51.04k | £49.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.53k | £21.66k | £33.77k | £20.16k | £29.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/09/1997 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/2008
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Foxley Lane
PURLEY
CR8 3ED
- Phone:
- 07956566197
- Email:
- nakosa7@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window