Accounts and annual returns ASIAN STROKE VICTIMS SUPPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1068054
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 13 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 24 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 24 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 24 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 24 October 2012 On Time