Financial history ASIAN STROKE VICTIMS SUPPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1068054
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £37.85k £34.90k £30.27k £30.32k £22.79k
Total expenditure £36.26k £34.46k £35.47k £44.22k £52.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A