Financial history HIBERNIA SCHOOL OF ARTISTIC THERAPY

Charity number: 1070277
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £148.52k £201.00k £207.91k £44.26k £0
Total expenditure £144.60k £220.60k £216.98k £57.46k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A