RAF COTTESMORE CHILDREN'S GROUPS COMMITTEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Rutland
Governance
- 22 December 1997: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.91k | £153.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.13k | £177.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 12 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 12 July 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND CHILD-CARE FACILITIES PRIMARILY FOR THE CHILDREN OF SERVICE PERSONNEL (AND MOD EMPLOYEES) STATIONED AT ROYAL AIR FORCE COTTESMORE OR OTHER, LOCAL ROYAL AIR FORCE STATIONS. WHERE VACANCIES EXIST, THE SAME FACILITIES WILL BE OFFERED TO CHILDREN FROM THE LOCAL CIVILIAN COMMUNITY. ALL INCOME IS TO BE INVESTED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window