BHATIA ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) Organise religious activities like Navratri and Diwali. (2) Donate to other charities like British Heart Foundation etc. (3) Donate to community members undertaking fundraising for other charities. (4) Organise cultural activities like drama, picnics, visits to Temples for the community members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROHIT BABLA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rajiv Bajaria | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anjana Swaly | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pratik Babla | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bipin Ratansinh Nanavati | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nita Sampat Shah | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sundip Madhursinh Okhai | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anoop Okhai | Trustee | 02 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mukesh Ved | Trustee | 02 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nilesh Kanaksinh Mamnani | Trustee | 02 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANAK SAMPAT | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHANDRESH SAMPAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.61k | £6.23k | £15.24k | £31.01k | £45.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.17k | £1.87k | £14.92k | £28.07k | £22.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 25/04/1999 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE HINDU RELIGION. IN SO DOING TO MAKE GRANTS TO INSTITUTIONS OR BODIES PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL CLASSES IN SUBJECTS WHICH MAY INCLUDE HINDU HERITAGE AND CULTURE, SUCH AS ART, DRAMA, HISTORY, EXHIBITIONS, PUBLICATIONS, LITERATURE, SEMINARS, LECTURES, DANCE AND MUSIC. (B) TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS BY MEANS OF FOSTERING GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT GROUPS. (C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND AWARDS TO THOSE PERSONS IN NEED AND OR ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL BY THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 VERNON RISE
GREENFORD
UB6 0EQ
- Phone:
- 02088642011
- Email:
- rbabla@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window