Financial history THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE YOUNG ISRAEL OF NORTH NETANYA AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1065915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.11k £46.07k £52.38k £37.41k £26.62k
Total expenditure £26.87k £64.88k £47.45k £40.54k £27.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A