THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE YOUNG ISRAEL OF NORTH NETANYA AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Jewish religion, the advancement of education generally,the relief of the aged, poor and needy generally and the provision and assistance in the provision of a communal centre in the interests of social welfare in order to improve the quality of life of the residents of Netanya, Israel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Israel
Governance
- 19 November 1997: Standard registration
- BRITISH FRIENDS OF YINN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NORMAN STUART ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Martin Moser | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN FINE | Trustee | 12 December 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.11k | £46.07k | £52.38k | £37.41k | £26.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.87k | £64.88k | £47.45k | £40.54k | £27.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH JUNE 1997 AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 20 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION; AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY; AND (C) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, POOR AND NEEDY GENERALLY; AND (D) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNAL CENTRE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE RESIDENTS OF NETANYA; ALL AS PART OF THE WORK DONE BY THE YOUNG ISRAEL CONGREGATION OF NORTH NETANYA AND COMMUNITY CENTRE AT 39 SHLOMO HAMELECH STREET, NATANYA, ISRAEL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE")
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Deacons Heights
Barnet Lane
Elstree
BOREHAMWOOD
Hertfordshire
WD6 3QY
- Phone:
- 0203 566 3664
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window