ALLIANCE FRANCAISE DE MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
French Language and Cultural centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 12 February 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Chegwin | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaux Stivanin | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virginie Fayolle | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Leese | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Romain Sebastien BARDOT | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sirka Moore | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fred Blesser | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Vanderschelden | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
RODOLPHE SOULARD | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £392.56k | £360.76k | £334.74k | £329.52k | £403.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £512.12k | £470.06k | £356.65k | £315.18k | £362.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 13 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY BUT PARTICULARLY WITHIN GREATER MANCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS CONCERNING FRENCH LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, CULTURE AND ASSOCIATED MODES OF THOUGHT AND TO ADVANCE CULTURAL HARMONY AND LINGUISTIC DIVERSITY BY ENCOURAGING LINGUISTIC AND CULTURAL EXCHANGES, AND TO DO SO IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE CONSTITUTIONAL DOCUMENTS OF THE ALLIANCE FRANÇAISE DE PARIS FOUNDED IN 1883, THE WORK OF WHICH HAS BEEN CONTINUED, SINCE 2008, BY THE FOUNDATION ALLIANCE FRANÇAISE. THE ALLIANCE FRANÇAISE DE MANCHESTER IS FOUNDED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND HAS NO POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS AFFILIATIONS AND PROHIBITS ANY FORM OF DISCRIMINATION.
Area of benefit
NO LIMITS BUT PARTICULARLY WITHIN GREATER MANCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
125 PORTLAND STREET
MANCHESTER
M1 4QD
- Phone:
- 01612367117
- Email:
- reception@afmanchester.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window