Accounts and annual returns JOAN AND JACK SHAW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1068173
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 28 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 24 September 2009 328 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required