THE CHILD HEARING IMPAIRMENT AND LANGUAGE DEVELOPMENT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Summer & Half term activities Youth clubs (ages 5-10 years and 11-19 years) Residential Weekends 18-25 group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 07 August 1998: Standard registration
- CHILD DEAF YOUTH PROJECT (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Andrew Lister | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Craig Jones | Trustee | 04 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anita Duffy | Trustee |
|
||||||
Martina Bridget Hebb | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.39k | £6.85k | £17.83k | £45.31k | £46.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.23k | £21.15k | £26.23k | £43.84k | £27.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.20k | N/A | £5.50k | £28.29k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING WITH DEAFNESS THROUGHOUT THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
TEESIDE/BOUNDED BY THE FORMER COUNTY OF CLEVELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Middlesbrough Deaf Centre
Derwent Street
North Ormesby
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS3 6JB
- Phone:
- 01642 246705
- Email:
- a.beckett@cdyp.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window