ALMONDBURY HIGH SCHOOL COMMUNITY SPORTS CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Kirklees
Governance
- 12 January 1998: Standard registration
- 25 November 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 9 DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER SPORTING AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
ALMONDBURY AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window