STOCKPORT M.E. GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides advocacy/advice/information/activities to those with ME in and around the Stockport District of Greater Manchester, UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Oldham
- Stockport
Governance
- 26 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ben wickens | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Barry Schilling | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY LYNHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Nia Francis-Scrutton | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.39k | £2.84k | £2.73k | £2.30k | £3.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.93k | £3.06k | £2.87k | £2.43k | £4.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MYALGIC ENCEPHALOMYELITIS (M.E.)/ CHRONIC FATIGUE SYNDROME (C.F.S.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 CHARDIN AVENUE
MARPLE BRIDGE
STOCKPORT
SK6 5DN
- Phone:
- 01614490634
- Email:
- smeg2244@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window