THE DAVID LEAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's activities to achieve its objects include making awards (1) to other charities whose aims include similar aims (2) for Film student scholarships
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 December 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN PAUL MOULTON | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|||
Max William Thowless-Reeves | Trustee | 21 August 2017 |
|
|||
Sally Ruth Beard | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.29k | £183.81k | £250.96k | £222.59k | £166.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.27k | £149.97k | £195.73k | £97.91k | £229.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO CULTIVATE AND IMPROVE PUBLIC TASTE IN THE VISUAL ARTS IN PARTICULAR BY STIMULATING ORIGINAL AND CREATIVE WORK IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN THE FIELD OF FILM PRODUCTION ( IN PARTICULAR INCLUDING SCREENPLAY WRITING AND FILM PRODUCTION AND FILM EDITING) AND BY ENCOURAGING A HIGH STANDARD OF ART AND TECHNIQUE IN PERSONS ENGAGED IN SUCH FILM PRODUCTION AND BY ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF THE ARTS SCIENCES AND TECHNIQUES OF FILM PRODUCTION. 2) TO BENEFIT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO SUPPORT OR ESTABLISH
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
41A Eastgate Street
STAFFORD
ST16 2LZ
- Phone:
- 01785 503010
- Email:
- dlf@sorbus.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window