BUDDHIST INTERHELP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting understanding particularly of Vietnamese Buddhism and culture. Financial support: to help poor children in Vietnam obtain education, to assist Vietnamese monks and nuns train in meditation practice, to help those in need both in the UK and abroad Further funds are being raised to help develop centres for the teaching and practice of Buddhism in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- India
- Vietnam
Governance
- 03 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr THI PHUNG LY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Thong Ba Nguyen | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Lu | Trustee | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANH NGA PHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THI TUYET MAI NGUYEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.17k | £4.44k | £2.92k | £4.91k | £9.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.35k | £3.68k | £3.81k | £4.64k | £4.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2024 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE RELIEF, IN ACCORDANCE WITH BUDDHIST PRINCIPLES, OF PERSONS IN VIETNAM, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED. (2) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION AND FOR THE PROTECTION, PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF BUDDHISM.
Area of benefit
VIETNAM, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
280 Coldhams Lane
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3HN
- Phone:
- 07546999384
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window