THE ALBIN-DYER BERMONDSEY AND ROTHERHITHE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1067137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal object of the Charity is to relieve poverty and to advance such other charitable purposes as the Trustees shall from time to time decide in Bermondsey and Rotherhithe.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £3,312
Total expenditure: £501

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 January 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN PAUL DYER Trustee
None on record
SIMON GEORGE DYER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £4.40k £3.20k £3.51k £3.02k £3.31k
Total expenditure £2.46k £1.75k £845 £2.15k £501
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 12 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 12 October 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 11 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
F A ALBIN & SONS LTD
52 CULLING ROAD
LONDON
SE16 2TN
Phone:
02072376366
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available