Trustees 3RD WHITSTABLE (ALL SAINTS) SCOUT GROUP
Charity Number: 1065505

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP SANDEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nigel Farenden | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wilcox | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Shearman | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Bagnall | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Haseltine | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Michelle Nicholson | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Brunger | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN DAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.