ST IVES SURF LIVESAVING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Ives Surf Lifesaving Club aims to provide an enjoyable beach environment for club members and the St Ives community through: More people trained in surf lifesaving techniques; Provide opportunities to become involved in a satisfying and worthwhile activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 02 March 1998: Standard registration
- ST IVES SLSC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Wilson | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE SIMPSON | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|||||
STEVE ELLIOTT | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.43k | £2.12k | £34.61k | £18.79k | £38.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.63k | £9.26k | £30.68k | £22.41k | £37.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 June 2023 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 June 2023 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO SAVE LIVES BY PREVENTION OR RESCUE FROM THE BEACH IN THE AREA COMPRISING ST. IVES AND ITS IMMEDIATE AREA
Area of benefit
ST IVES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beachcroft Cottage
Valley Road
Carbis Bay
ST. IVES
Cornwall
TR26 2QS
- Phone:
- 07802420099
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window