THE CATERPILLAR CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A PRE-SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN AGED 2YRS 6MTHS - 5YRS DURING TERM TIME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £94,457 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 23 October 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALICE SAMUELS | Chair | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMY ARMOUR | Trustee | 16 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE PITCHER | Trustee | 16 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LUCAS | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Barbara Crow | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.31k | £97.10k | £86.85k | £103.93k | £119.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.68k | £72.76k | £83.90k | £103.31k | £114.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £66.43k | N/A | £78.26k | £81.55k | £94.46k | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50k | £62.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGEE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ferndown First School
Mountbatten Drive
Ferndown
BH22 9FB
- Phone:
- 01202893272
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window