Financial history REKINDLE

Charity number: 1067356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £73.79k £90.68k £120.79k £173.74k £164.53k
Total expenditure £72.43k £68.53k £91.97k £88.57k £152.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £22.43k £1.00k N/A