REKINDLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rekindle undertakes an early intervention support and recovery programme, called Small Steps, for young people who suffer from, or are at risk of, mental illness. The charity operates from rented premises in Newtown (Powys) currently with two experienced support workers working with around 80 service users. Service users may be self-referred or be referred from other agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 12 January 1998: Standard registration
- 22 April 2024: Funds received from 1083202 CAE POST LIMITED
- REKINDLE (Working name)
- REKINDLE HOME (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard John Bland | Chair | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Louise Greenwood | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Darlington | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Davies | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frederic Roger Mathieu | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Andrew Stratton | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.79k | £90.68k | £120.79k | £173.74k | £164.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.43k | £68.53k | £91.97k | £88.57k | £152.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £22.43k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 05 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING OR RECOVERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS IN THE AREA OF SHROPSHIRE AND MID-WALES ("THE AREA") BY THE PROVISION OF CARE AND STIMULUS THROUGH EDUCATION, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE OCCUPATION AND APPROPRIATE EMPLOYMENT IN A HOME OR HOMES IN SURROUNDINGS CONDUCIVE TO SUCH OBJECT.
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE AND MID-WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rekindle
Ladywell Business Centre
New Church Street
Newtown
Powys
SY16 1AF
- Phone:
- 01686 722222
- Email:
- Chair@rekindle.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window