PEMBROKE DOCK MUSEUM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Museum and preservation of history. The building used has been going through repairs by the local County Council and closed during the year, we look to reopening again during 2016.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 28 November 1997: Standard registration
- 28 November 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £119 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | £2.18k | £2.10k | £1.30k | £2.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 January 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 3 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PEMBROKESHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
PEMBROKESHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window