OXFORD INTER-COLLEGIATE CHRISTIAN UNION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion as revealed in the Bible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 19 January 1998: Standard registration
- 28 April 2009: Removed (Exempt charity)
- OICCU (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.04k | £35.95k | £43.80k | £35.29k | £44.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.56k | £39.25k | £45.42k | £37.59k | £36.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 02 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 07 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 26 February 2008 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 29 February 2008 | 29 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 26 February 2008 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 26 February 2008 | 391 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 August 2006 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 15 August 2006 | 196 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 02 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 06 April 2005 | 65 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 1997, AMENDED 7 MARCH 1998 AMENDED 6 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED 4 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION AS REVEALED IN THE BIBLE BY: 1. PRESENTING THE CLAIMS OF JESUS CHRIST TO MEMBERS OF THE UNIVERSITY 2. UNITING IN FELLOWSHIP THOSE WHO DESIRE TO WITNESS FOR CHRIST AND TO DEEPEN THEIR SPIRITUAL LIVES 3. THE PROMOTION OF INVOLVEMENT IN GODS WORK WORLD-WIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window