Financial history FRIENDS OF HEPWORTH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1065522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.81k £1.63k £6.63k £8.34k £8.53k
Total expenditure £12.61k £9.00k £6.41k £8.20k £3.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A