PAINTINGS IN HOSPITALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PAINTINGS IN HOSPITALS USES EXCEPTIONAL ART AND CREATIVE ACTIVITIES TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH, WELLBEING AND QUALITY OF LIFE FOR PEOPLE WITH ILLNESS, INJURY, ADDICTION, AUTISM AND DISABILITY. OUR ACTIVITIES HELP TO REDUCE LEVELS OF SICKNESS, ANXIETY AND STRESS IN PATIENTS, SERVICES USERS, CARE STAFF AND THE PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 20 November 1997: Standard registration
- PIH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JANE ANDERSON | Chair | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Catherine Mary Jane Vickery | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Patrick Stather Bourne | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Amanda Eve Pinto | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Robert John Milburn | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Farha Tahera Quadri | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr MARION LYNCH | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £468.39k | £250.49k | £593.85k | £363.14k | £320.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £486.27k | £366.96k | £426.37k | £438.44k | £443.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £424.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £24.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £142.39k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £2.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £405.04k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £21.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/10/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/01/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/03/2012 as amended on 24 Apr 2019 as amended on 12 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO USE ART AND CREATIVE ACTIVITIES TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH, WELL-BEING AND QUALITY OF LIFE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION, ILLNESS, INJURY, DISORDER OR DISABILITY INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) ANY DISABILITY OR DISORDER ON THE AUTISTIC SPECTRUM IN ANY LOCATION OR ESTABLISHMENT WHERE ANY SUCH PERSON IS RESIDENT OR IN ATTENDANCE OR WHERE ANY SUCH PERSON IS IN RECEIPT OF TREATMENT, THERAPY, CONVALESCENCE, TRAINING, EDUCATION OR ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Earlsfield Business Centre
Unit 11
9 Lydden Road
Earlsfield
London
SW18 4LT
- Phone:
- 07722199901
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window