YSGOL GYNRADD TRELOGAN PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to benefit all the children at Ysgol Trelogan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Flintshire
Governance
- 19 January 1998: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 October 2015: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEULWEN SIAN CLOSS-SHARP | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £971 | £3.17k | £1.22k | £713 | |
|
Total expenditure | £550 | £1.28k | £679 | £4.04k | £188 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ysgol Gynradd Trelogan
Berthengam
Treffynnon
Sir y fflint
CH8 9BZ
- Phone:
- 01745 560432
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window