Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN PONTYBEREM

Charity Number: 1066893
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £64.00k £67.32k £53.16k £127.77k £112.41k
Total expenditure £54.47k £63.27k £62.33k £86.35k £75.87k
Income from government contracts £33.35k £23.01k £31.07k £58.87k £64.27k
Income from government grants £1.00k £14.83k £9.79k £8.83k £6.12k