Financial history ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN WRITERS

Charity number: 1069839
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.67k £28.57k £27.29k £31.40k £23.76k
Total expenditure £33.78k £15.92k £26.24k £35.92k £18.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A