HOPGROVE PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sports facilities for football, cricket and archery as well as a location for Ebor model railways to meet
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £19,431 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Chan | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Tannam | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Leadbetter | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bunce | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Shaw | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Shields | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kerrison | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.48k | £11.83k | £12.06k | £14.28k | £20.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.22k | £17.67k | £13.47k | £17.34k | £8.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £19.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUNDS AND PLAYING FIELDS FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF HUNTINGTON AND HEWORTH
Area of benefit
HUNTINGTON AND HEWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hopgrove Playing Fields Association
Malton Road
YORK
YO32 9TD
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- hopgrovepfa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window