Accounts and annual returns CRISIS PREGNANCY CENTRE, CORNWALL

Charity number: 1065024
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 16 June 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 16 June 2011 14 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 16 June 2010 11 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 16 June 2009 21 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 June 2009 Not Required