Financial history CRISIS PREGNANCY CENTRE, CORNWALL

Charity number: 1065024
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/06/2007 16/06/2008 16/06/2009 16/06/2010 16/06/2011
Total gross income £5.92k £14.07k £2.77k £2.90k £5.83k
Total expenditure £5.56k £5.33k £6.77k £5.43k £3.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A