GOWER YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A RURAL YOUTH ORGANISATION FOR PEOPLE INTERESTED IN THE RURAL COMMUNITY AGED BETWEEN 10-26 YEARS OLD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 22 December 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Hopkins | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Evan Ormond Lloyd | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.75k | £391 | £5.40k | £2.96k | £5.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £832 | £3.12k | £1.24k | £6.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 287 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 27TH AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG FARMERS IN THE SUBJECTS OF AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREAT LUNNON FARM
LUNNON
PARKMILL
SWANSEA
SA3 2EJ
- Phone:
- 01792371351
- Email:
- goweryfc@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window