Accounts and annual returns THE SIR IAN MORROW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1065836
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2006 16 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 16 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2005 28 February 2006 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2004 08 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required