THE SIR IAN MORROW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1065836
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2005

Total income: £640
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 November 1997: Standard registration
  • 08 September 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2004 05/04/2005
Total gross income £613 £640
Total expenditure £1.38k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2006 16 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 16 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2005 28 February 2006 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2004 08 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required