D.S.R. ASSERTIVE OUTREACH SERVICE FOR THE HOMELESS
Charity Number: 1067463
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Doncaster
Governance
Registration history:
- 15 January 1998: Standard registration
- 22 May 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- D.S.R. ASSERTIVE OUTREACH SERVICE FOR HOMELESS (Previous name)
- THE DONCASTER SOUP RUN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 12 JANUARY 1998 AND 28 FEBRUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF HOMELESS PERSONS IN DONCASTER AND DISTRICT AREA IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD ADVICE AND GUIDANCE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DONCASTER AND DISTRICT AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window