Financial history ROCKINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1073307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.01k £2.40k £9.67k £6.78k £9.04k
Total expenditure £8.89k £8.90k £8.03k £12.40k £8.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A