Trustees ROCKINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1073307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Kingman Chair 05 October 2014
None on record
Suzanne Glover Trustee 22 May 2024
OPEN DOOR CHURCH (KETTERING)
Received: On time
Sarah Scales Trustee 31 May 2023
None on record
Claire Johnson Trustee 05 October 2015
None on record
James Martin Trustee 15 May 2015
None on record
DAVID GEORGE NORMAN Trustee
None on record
TREVOR CHARLES BURBIDGE Trustee
None on record
IAN JAMES NORMAN Trustee
None on record