FRIENDS OF SAINT PETER AND SAINT PAUL'S CHURCH FARNINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support to the upkeep and maintenance of the fabric of the church of St Peter and St Paul Farningham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 12 February 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERYL GEORGINA SAUNDERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Ann Moore | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Stephen Howard Payne | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER BOWLES | Trustee | 04 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER RICHARD DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.49k | £4.76k | £4.85k | £5.06k | £6.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £4.67k | £1.23k | £25.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED ON THE 1 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE BUILDING KNOWN AS SAINT PETER AND SAINT PAUL'S CHURCH FARNINGHAM.
Area of benefit
KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHARTON MANOR FARM
GORSE HILL
FARNINGHAM
DARTFORD
DA4 0JT
- Phone:
- 01322862262
- Email:
- mail@efl-churches.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window