GREAT CHART VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hiring out of the Great Chart Village Hall for social events and the meeting of uniform groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £5,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 15 February 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL TATE | Chair | 12 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
William Thomas Watkinson | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian McClintock | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|||||
GILL TATE | Trustee | 12 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILL WEST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.66k | £25.09k | £14.51k | £14.77k | £20.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.48k | £10.17k | £15.05k | £9.71k | £10.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.19k | £2.67k | £5.00k | £5.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 1938
Charitable objects
ALL PAYMENT IN RESPECT OF THE SAID HALL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST GABLES
SINGLETON ROAD
GREAT CHART
ASHFORD
TN23 3BA
- Phone:
- 01233636419
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window