KNOWLE WEST ALCOHOL AND DRUGS SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide free and confidential advice, guidance and support and structured services for those concerned about their own or someone else's substance misuse. KWADS aims to reduce the harm that substance misuse has on individuals, families and the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 27 May 1998: Standard registration
- 28 February 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 28 February 2014: Funds transferred to 1120320 HAWKSPRING
- KWADS (Working name)
- KNOWLE WEST AGAINST DRUGS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.56k | £152.89k | £180.90k | £182.41k | £207.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £264.29k | £134.60k | £170.14k | £189.89k | £204.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 24 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 24 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 04 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 04 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 30 September 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 2001 AND 25 FEBRUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION OF CHEMICAL DEPENDENCY AND DRUG ABUSE BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE DANGERS OF SUCH DEPENDENCY AND ABUSE AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ON ALL RELATED MATTERS AND ENCOURAGING POLICY LIAISON; B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND STRESS AMONG PERSONS AFFECTED BY OR DEPENDENT UPON DRUGS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE REHABILITATION OF SUCH PERSONS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, BEFRIENDING AND OTHER SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window