Financial history MANTELL GWYNEDD CYF

Charity number: 1068851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £848.01k £778.75k £744.18k £603.49k £1.28m
Total expenditure £891.19k £606.62k £791.81k £648.77k £1.23m
Income from government contracts £550.91k £520.61k £371.19k £405.31k £351.14k
Income from government grants N/A £187.84k £259.25k £91.26k £825.40k
Income - Donations and legacies £194.98k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £650.62k £404.07k £527.80k £354.67k £1.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.42k £2.38k £1.35k £2.24k £12.98k
Income - Other £0 £372.30k £215.03k £246.58k £262.71k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £891.19k £606.62k £791.81k £648.77k £1.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.29k £6.31k £5.71k £7.72k £6.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.30k £87.23k £236.19k £81.20k £753.67k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0