MIRFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GIVE THREE CONCERTS A YEAR TO THE PUBLIC OF CHORAL MUSIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 12 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ruth Eluned Wood | Chair | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Speight | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE WEBSTER | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MAUREEN HALL | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MASON | Trustee | 28 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MIKE GLOVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.77k | £3.99k | £4.20k | £11.46k | £13.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.70k | £3.43k | £4.43k | £8.89k | £15.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2011 as amended on 12 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CHORAL CONCERTS, AND FOR SUCH OTHER WAY AS THE SOCIETY MAY CHOOSE FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. IT SHALL CONSIST OF A MIXED VOICE CHOIR FOR THE PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF BOTH SECULAR AND SACRED VOCAL MUSIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Westfields Avenue
Mirfield
WF14 9PL
- Phone:
- 07932395821
- Email:
- mirfieldchoral@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window