Trustees MIRFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1077753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Ruth Eluned Wood Chair 27 March 2023
None on record
Sally Elizabeth Speight Trustee 10 April 2017
None on record
CATHERINE WEBSTER Trustee 24 April 2013
None on record
PAMELA MAUREEN HALL Trustee 08 May 2012
None on record
RACHEL MASON Trustee 28 May 2011
None on record
MIKE GLOVER Trustee
None on record