TELFORD, OAKENGATES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1065156
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Arranging meetings for public worship, which includes Bible education and training in Christian living. Preaching the Christian message to the public within the congregation area. Distributing Bibles and other religious literature; also giving pastoral assistance to the congregation and wider community. All of these services and facilities are provided without charge.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £11,575
Total expenditure: £9,162

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 1997: Standard registration
  • 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.53k £10.30k £10.75k £7.99k £11.58k
Total expenditure £10.73k £9.20k £9.50k £9.24k £9.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required