SUTTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL CENTENARY APPEAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 November 1997: Standard registration
- 10 January 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £3.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £319 | £114.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 13 February 2006 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 13 February 2006 | 13 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 24TH OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SUTTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, TO RAISE FUNDS FOR A NEW SPORTS COMPLEX AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
SUTTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window