NORFOLK CITIZENS ADVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Citizens Advice service aims to: Provide the advice people need for the problems they face Improve the policies and practices that affect peoples lives Our free, independent, confidential and impartial advice and information services are available to all residents of Norfolk regardless of race, gender, disability, sexuality or nationality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,315,085
Donations and legacies | £7.13k | |
Charitable activities | £2.30m | |
Other trading activities | £3.23k | |
Investments | £4.77k | |
Other | £2.66k |
Total expenditure:
£2,216,079
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.22m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £702,120 from 5 government contract(s) and £557,621 from 9 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.22m | |
Retained for future use | £99.01k |
People

49 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
145 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- NORFOLK CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- NORFOLK CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- NORFOLK CITIZEN'S ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- NORWICH AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- NORWICH AND WEST NORFOLK CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF NORFOLK CITIZENS ADVICE (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Leslie West | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD STEFAN CONNOLLY | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peta Banks | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Anne Massey | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin George Meen | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER PATRICK MARGAND | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Mole | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Paul Davis | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Gray | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Smith | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Browne | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|||||
CHARLOTTE LAND | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52m | £1.99m | £2.12m | £2.13m | £2.32m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49m | £1.95m | £2.02m | £2.04m | £2.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £745.49k | £702.12k | |
|
Income from government grants | £478.36k | £484.31k | £431.16k | £422.93k | £557.62k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £31.58k | £88.08k | £54.00k | £43.64k | £7.13k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.23k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.48m | £1.90m | £2.07m | £2.08m | £2.30m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £774 | £998 | £857 | £2.59k | £4.77k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £1.52k | £0 | £865 | £2.66k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £61.00k | £17.32k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.49m | £1.95m | £2.02m | £2.04m | £2.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £7.73k | £6.81k | £0 | £14.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £48.45k | £33.92k | £19.38k | £4.85k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £833.65k | £833.44k | £948.98k | £1.26m | £1.33m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £228.61k | £171.46k | £174.39k | £379.67k | £348.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 AUG 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 OCT 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 JAN 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 SEP 2012 as amended on 28 Nov 2018 as amended on 22 Sep 2023 as amended on 14 Dec 2012 as amended on 11 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
The Charity's objects are to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the community in Norfolk and elsewhere in the United Kingdom.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF NORWICH AND IN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS OF BROADLAND AND SOUTH NORFOLK AND EAST ANGLIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pottergate House
83-87 Pottergate
Norwich
NR2 1DZ
- Phone:
- 01603 273110
- Email:
- public@ncab.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window